HI HB1465 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Re-Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to be used by the Department of Education for the repair and maintenance of public school buildings, grounds, and facilities in the State. (HB1465 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateRe-Referred to WAM.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 492).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1223) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 646) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:35PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback