HI HB1462 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to GVO/LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the State Auditor to study the feasibility of providing health benefits to state and county employees using a self-insured model. Appropriates funds. Establishes the Rate Stabilization Reserve Fund. Caps employer contributions to the Other Post-Employment Benefits Trust Fund. Provides for the use of a portion of TAT revenues to supplement deficient county public employer contribution amounts. (HB1462 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Unfunded Liabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to GVO/LCA, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 307).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1120), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-02-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-20HouseRe-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 25
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-31HouseRe-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB/LMG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback