HI HB1460 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "private entity" to include business organizations that are authorized to transact business in the State, including nonprofit management entities that have a certificate of need or license to operate one or more community hospitals or hospitals serving a rural population licensed under the laws of any state. Beginning January 1, 2024, requires the Chief Executive Officer of the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation or the Chief Executive Officer's designee, before entering into any new agreement or modifying or terminating any existing agreement, to provide written comments to the Governor.
Title
Relating To Public-private Partnerships For The Delivery Of Health Care Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1460 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1016 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
SB1016 (Same As) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Subjects
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation
Maui Regional System Facilities
Private Entity
Public-private Partnerships
Maui Regional System Facilities
Private Entity
Public-private Partnerships
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1460&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB1460_.HTM |