HI HB146 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that Campaign Spending Commission personnel includes staff and that the staff may initiate complaints on behalf of the commission.
Title
Relating To Campaign Spending Commission Staff.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-17 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-17-21 at 10:30 am. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB406 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB146 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB146 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=146&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB146_.HTM |