HI HB1453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 140, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act 140, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the DOH to establish fees for ground transportation to medical facilities and for provision of emergency medical services that do not include transport. Authorizes transportation by ambulance to medical facilities other than hospital emergency departments. Authorizes Medicaid programs to provide coverage for health care provided by emergency medical services personnel. (HB1453 CD2)
Title
Relating To Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act 140, 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2019-06-28 | House | Act 140, on 06/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1242). |
2019-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 888). |
2019-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 970). |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Say voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (3). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 05-02-19. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Report filed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Separated Committee Report. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 22 offered. |
2019-04-30 | House | Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused. |
2019-04-30 | House | Floor Amendment No. 6 offered by Rep. Belatti. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 93). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 93) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki, S. Chang, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Luke, Cullen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 825). |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 3:05PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Luke Co-Chairs; Cullen, Ward. |
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 862) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2016) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1416) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |