HI HB1452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and appropriates funds for the Hawaii Legal Aid Interagency Roundtable to facilitate cooperation between various state agencies regarding civil legal services and access to justice. Appropriates funds for the Judiciary to purchase civil legal services for low- and moderate-income persons. (HB1452 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Civil Legal Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 489).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1233) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 313), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
2019-02-07HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback