HI HB1445 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Executive Office on Aging to include details on outcomes of the Kupuna Caregivers Program in its annual report. Requires Office on Aging to create a plan to maximize number of participants in the program and offer core services, requires plan submission to Legislature. Appropriates funds for program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Kupuna Care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseThe committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:35AM in conference room 329.
2019-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-14-19 at 8:45 AM.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:45AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback