HI HB1444 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 044, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 044, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires pharmacy benefit managers to register with the Insurance Commissioner. (HB1444 CD1)
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Act 044, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144). |
2017-06-22 | House | Act 044, on 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 38). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 38) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takumi, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Kidani. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Tupola. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 656) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1527) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Inouye. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1098) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 352). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 981) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-02-24 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:55PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-17. |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 282) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.