HI HB1442 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1442

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Justice Diversion Program including allowing examination of defendants via telehealth. Requires the Judiciary, in consultation with other stakeholders, to submit monthly and annual reports to the Legislature on the effectiveness of agreements for post-booking jail diversion programs for district and circuit court in the first circuit. Amends the allowable period of court-ordered assisted community treatment and considerations for extensions. Allows courts to require certain probation violators to undergo mental health evaluation and treatment as a condition of continued probation. Requires the Department of Health to contract with behavioral health crisis centers and to establish a statewide Hawaii Urgency Response Center. Restores funding for probation officer services for the mental health court. Effective 7/1/3023. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Rehabilitation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-28HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
2023-04-27HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 2:30PM in conference room 329.
2023-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 2:30PM in conference room 329.
2023-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-23 2:30PM in conference room 329.
2023-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-23 2:30PM in conference room 329.
2023-04-24SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
2023-04-21HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Tarnas, Takenouchi Co-Chairs; Garcia.
2023-04-20HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914).
2023-04-20SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; San Buenaventura, Moriwaki Co-Chairs; Awa.
2023-04-14SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
2023-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2023-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 876) in amended form (SD 1).
2023-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
2023-04-06SenateOne Day Notice 04-11-23.
2023-04-06SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1890) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2023-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2023-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2023-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2023-03-24SenateReported from JDC/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2023-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2023-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
2023-03-09SenateReferred to JDC/HHS, WAM.
2023-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 229).
2023-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aiu, Garcia, Kila, Lamosao, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-02-23HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila, Lamosao, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-17HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
2023-02-17HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2023-02-15HouseThe committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
2023-02-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
2023-02-09HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2023-02-08HouseThe committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-03HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
2023-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

HB1442 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 4:30PM in conference room 309.
SB1540 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback