HI HB1441 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1441
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the homelessness fund. Increases the conveyance tax and directs revenues towards experimental or demonstration housing projects administered by HFCD and by HPHA and homeless facilities and programs administered by DHS.
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HUS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1441 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Referred to HUS, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1441&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1441_.HTM |