HI HB1441 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to THA/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism and Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to THA/TEC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Tourism and Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a museum of music, dance, and cultural arts design committee. Authorizes the committee to invite developers to prepare plans, specifications, and designs for a new museum, and to review for approval the proposed museum development plans submitted by developers. Makes an appropriation for design of the museum.
Title
Museum for Music, Dance, and Cultural Arts; Hawaiian Music; Hawaiian Dance; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to THA/TEC, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 367). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 825), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:30AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 300), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Kawakami, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-08-13 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-05 | House | Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 14 |
2013-02-01 | House | Re-referred to VMI, OMH, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2013-01-28 | House | Referred to VMI/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |