HI HB144 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB144

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals section 46-19.8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to allow the counties to determine the proper requirements for residential fire sprinkler systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-25HouseReferred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
2023-01-19HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-17HousePrefiled.

Same As/Similar To

HB144 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
SB191 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Re-Referred to PSM, CPN/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback