HI HB1435 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all places of public accommodation and state building construction constructed or substantially modified after 12/31/20 to provide baby diaper-changing accommodations and baby feeding accommodations that are equally accessible to men and women. (HB1435 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Gender Equity.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 312.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 111) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback