HI HB1422 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1422
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the fiscal biennium 2019-2021 operating budget of the Department of Health programs under the purview of the House of Representatives Standing Committee on Health. (HB1422 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 487). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 664) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:45AM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 02-14-19 at 8:45 AM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1422 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH, WAM.