HI HB142 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB142
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any restaurant that offers a children's meal to offer water, non-flavored milk, a nondairy milk substitute that has no more than 130 calories per container or serving, or no more than eight fluid ounces of fruit or vegetable juice as the default beverage choice accompanying the meal. (HB142 HD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 772) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-11 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 19 |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommitted to HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Nakamura excused. |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 249) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB142 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).