HI HB1419 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Disability and Communication Access Board to develop, publish, and periodically update information and communication technology disability access standards to be implemented by state entities. Effective 7/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Electronic Information Technology Accessibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 109). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 848-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ilagan, Todd. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from HHH/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-17 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-17 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH/HET on Thursday, 02-17-22 11:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to HHH/HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-14 | House | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Disability Access
Disability and Communication Access Board
Hawaii Information and Communication Technology Disability Access Standards ($)
Information and Communication Technology
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Disability and Communication Access Board
Hawaii Information and Communication Technology Disability Access Standards ($)
Information and Communication Technology
Office of Enterprise Technology Services