HI HB1412 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1412
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Department of Budget and Finance budget.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Budget And Finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1412 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1412&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1412_.HTM |