HI HB1410 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1410
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Emergency Medical Services Special Fund and appropriates an equal amount of general funds to the Department of Health for emergency medical services. Appropriates funds for community paramedic services. Effective 7/1/2090. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Emergency Medical Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 684). |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Tokuda added as Co-Chair. Senator Shimabukuro discharged as Co-Chair. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 508) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-06-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1281) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 972) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 346). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har, Nakamura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 160) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-02 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Har, Oshiro, Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1410 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Community Paramedic Services
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Medical Services Special Fund
Community Paramedic Services
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Medical Services Special Fund