HI HB141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB141
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public schools, private schools, and public charter schools to have an employee trained to administer seizure disorder rescue medication. Exempts schools that do not have a student with a seizure disorder. Requires a seizure action plan for every diagnosed student and distribution of the plan to employees charged with supervising the student. Requires all principals, guidance counselors, and teachers to perform self-review of seizure disorder materials annually. Makes an appropriation. Effective July 1, 2030. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Reported from CPH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3456) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Dela Cruz. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EDU, WAM. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 279). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007-20) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 628-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-13-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-06-20 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommitted to HLT as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Representative(s) Nakamura excused. |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HLT for further consideration. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Say. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-05-19 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB141 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 19
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Education
School Employee Training
Seizure Disorder Rescue Medication
Seizure Safe Schools
Education
School Employee Training
Seizure Disorder Rescue Medication
Seizure Safe Schools