HI HB14 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans minors from using ATV's; provides a ban on riding in truck beds; mandatory helmet law for all two-wheeled vehicles and ATV's; mandate video screens be behind driver; prohibits cell phone operation except for hands free; prohibits the use of electronic wireless communication devices while operating a motor vehicle. Prohibits text messaging, gaming, and e-mailing while operating a motor vehicle.
Title
Omnibus traffic safety bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 02-11-09 8:30am in conference room 309. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill re-scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-11-09 8:30am in conference room 309. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-11-09 8:30am in House conference room 306. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2009-01-22 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=14&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB14_.HTM |