HI HB1387 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to establish a pilot program to ensure that all housing units in the Kuhio Park Terrace and Puuwai Momi public housing complexes are provided with sufficient internet speeds and connection quality. Appropriates moneys.
Title
Relating To Public Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB910 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1387 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1387 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Distance Learning
HPHA
Internet
Kuhio Park Terrace
Pilot Program
Public Housing
Puuwai Momi
Distance Learning
HPHA
Internet
Kuhio Park Terrace
Pilot Program
Public Housing
Puuwai Momi
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1387&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1387_.HTM |