HI HB1386 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1386

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows no more than two members of the board of land and natural resources, one of which may be the chairperson, to determine items that shall be placed on a meeting agenda and any discussion between the two members shall be a permitted interaction under the sunshine law. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Board Of Land And Natural Resources.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
2023-02-17HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 640) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2023-02-14HouseThe committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Ganaden, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chun, Hashem.
2023-02-10HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 8:30AM in conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

HB1386 (Carry Over) 2023-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback