HI HB1386 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1386

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii Community Development Authority (HCDA) to designate transit-oriented development community districts along the Honolulu Rail Station Transit Corridor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transit Oriented Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on TRN/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Wednesday, 02-08-17 11:00AM in House conference room 423.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to TRN/HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

HB1386 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback