HI HB1384 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1384

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Beginning on January 1, 2022, requires each managed care organization to annually report its medical loss ratio to the department of human services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Loss Ratios.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1365 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB1384 (Carry Over) 2021-02-01 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback