HI HB1381 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1381
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the scope of work for elevator mechanics. Amends the licensing requirements for elevator mechanics, and the powers and duties of the Elevator Mechanics Licensing Board. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Elevator Mechanics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Holt Co-Chairs; Fukumoto, Keohokalole, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 981) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 341). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Fukumoto. |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-02-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-17. |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:01PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1381 (Carry Over) 2017-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).