HI HB138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB138
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii medical board to establish standards for health care providers to ensure that a patient's consent to treatment is an informed consent. Requires that informed consent for a proposed medical or surgical treatment or a diagnostic or therapeutic procedure be obtained prior to the day of that treatment or procedure. Specifies that if the treatment or procedure is to occur on the same day it is scheduled, the informed consent shall be obtained at the time the decision is made to schedule that treatment or procedure.
Title
Relating To Medical Informed Consent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB138 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB203 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Re-Referred to HTH, CPN.
SB203 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Re-Referred to HTH, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=138&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB138_.HTM |