HI HB1378 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the owner of a shipping container chassis to keep a duplicate copy of the certificate of registration within the shipping container chassis. Requires the owner of a shipping container chassis to make available the original certificate of registration at its principal place of business in the State. (HB1378 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 287) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback