HI HB1378 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1378
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to develop plans for the construction of secondary access roads for the Waianae district of leeward Oahu. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Highways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 191). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 920), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1378 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.