HI HB1377 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an electronic citation program under the judiciary and establishes a temporary electronic citation surcharge. Effective 1/1/2022. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Citations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Failed to pass Final Reading. Ayes, 9. Noes, 16 (Senator(s) Acasio, Chang, Dela Cruz, Fevella, Ihara, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Taniguchi, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 77). |
2021-04-22 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-22 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 77) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 2:30PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 2:30PM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 787) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1198) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-23-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 9:15AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 311). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 570), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1377 (Carry Over) 2021-04-28 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).