HI HB1376 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Act 057, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the required period for a notice of termination of the rental agreement from five days to fifteen days. Requires landlords to provide notice with specified terms and enter into mediation. Delays when a landlord may seek possession of a dwelling unit if the tenant schedules or attempts to schedule mediation. Requires landlords to provide the notice of termination of the rental agreement to a mediation center that offers free mediation for residential landlord-tenant disputes. Restricts when a landlord may exercise these remedies depending on the amount of rent due. Appropriates funds. Repeals certain provisions one year after expiration of the governor's final eviction moratorium emergency supplementary proclamation related to the coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic or 12/31/2022, whichever is sooner. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Landlord-tenant Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateAct 057, 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
2021-06-21HouseAct 057, on 06/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1157).
2021-04-28HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2021-04-28SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
2021-04-28HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
2021-04-27HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-04-27SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-23Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
2021-04-23SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 163).
2021-04-23HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21.
2021-04-23HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 163) as amended in (CD 1).
2021-04-21SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
2021-04-21HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Luke, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 4:15PM; CR 229.
2021-04-20HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-21 1:30PM in conference room CR 229.
2021-04-19HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-20-21 1:30PM in conference room CR 229.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
2021-04-19HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 809).
2021-04-16HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-19-21 1:30PM in conference room CR 229.
2021-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English, Rhoads Co-Chairs.
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
2021-04-16SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
2021-04-15HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2021-04-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 786) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-04-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1709) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
2021-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2021-03-25SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1140) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2021-03-23SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 10:00AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
2021-03-11SenateReferred to CPN, WAM/JDC.
2021-03-11SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 310).
2021-03-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 887) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 379) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-08HouseProposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1388 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback