HI HB1375 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1375
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization to issue special purpose revenue bonds to assist MauiGrown Coffee, Inc., with the operation and expansion of its farm and mill.
Title
Relating To The Issuance Of Special Purpose Revenue Bonds To Assist Mauigrown Coffee, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 446), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1375 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
SB1297 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SB1297 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).