HI HB1359 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows each county to enact and enforce ordinances necessary to prevent, investigate, control, or eradicate invasive species identified by the Hawaii invasive species council on any public or private premises within the limits of the county. (HB1359 HD2)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 986) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 260) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1359 (Carry Over) 2017-03-17 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
SB409 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM.
SB409 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM.