HI HB1355 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1355
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires procurement officers to document whether to pursue a design professional or contractor for damages in the event of construction cost overruns. Requires the chief procurement officer to compile a public list of construction companies or design professionals that are in noncompliance with the procurement code or owe penalties. Makes construction cost overruns a tort for purposes of the design claim conciliation panel. Requires bids for a contract under the competitive sealed bidding process to include a liability contingency fund. Requires the state procurement office to include training on the duty of procurement officers to hold design professionals liable for breaches of professional standards. Makes cost overruns a construction defect for the purposes of the contractor repair act. Establishes a procurement professional standards task force. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To State Procurement Reform.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Greggor Ilagan [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21 at 9:45AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-05-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1355 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Subjects
Construction Cost Overruns
Design Professionals
Procurement Officers
State Procurement Code
Task Force
Training
Design Professionals
Procurement Officers
State Procurement Code
Task Force
Training