HI HB1355 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission within the Department of Taxation to review and make recommendations on expenditures, revenue enhancement, and tax policy. (HB1355 HD1)
Title
Commission on Fiscal Responsibility; Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 184). |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Saiki, Tupola excused (3). |
2016-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 842-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-01-16 11:02AM in House conference room 308. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |