HI HB1344 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 10:01AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 10:01AM in conference room 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows journalists and newscasters, under the supervision of emergency management agency personnel, to cover the mitigation of hazardous situations and access areas that are closed pursuant to emergency management powers of the governor and mayor. Authorizes and appropriates funds for two positions to oversee the mitigation of hazardous situations program in the department of defense. Eff. 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Department of Defense; Mitigation of Hazardous Situations; News Media Access; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 10:01AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-25 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-27-16 3:30PM in conference room 312. |
2016-04-25 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 703). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; English Co-Chair; Espero, Inouye, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 612). |
2016-04-18 | House | House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Har. |
2016-04-13 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:45 pm in Conference Room 312. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Galuteria, Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; Har, San Buenaventura, Tupola. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 618) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1518) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-09-15 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 124). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Pouha excused (1). |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 318), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Tupola. |
2015-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-12-15 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |