HI HB1341 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1341
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the exemption of persons with disabilities from minimum wage requirements. Takes effect on 1/1/2020.
Title
Relating To The Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1341 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB336 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/CPH, WAM.
SB336 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/CPH, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1341&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1341_.HTM |