HI HB1333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1333
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Department of Public Safety budget. (HB1333 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Public Safety Operating Budget.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 467). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1283) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger. |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 579) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1333 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - The committee(s) on PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.