HI HB1326 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1326
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a narrow hearsay exception for statements made by domestic violence victims during the course of the first interaction with the responding law enforcement officers and before the arrest of the defendant, as long as the statement bears sufficient indicia of reliability. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Domestic Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima Chair; Nakamura, Ward. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 320). |
2021-03-30 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 468) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-29-21. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Perruso, Tokioka voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, McKelvey, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Nakamura; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1326 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).