HI HB1325 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1325
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public contractors to obtain insurance to cover at least half of a project's construction costs to the State to provide funds for curing construction defects discovered within ten years after the completion of the contract. Authorizes the State to institute an action against the contractor for the total costs of curing those defects. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Procurement Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 253) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Cullen, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Ichiyama. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill re-scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-10-21 11:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-10-21 at 9:45AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Friday, 02-05-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1325 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.