HI HB1316 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Part I: Requires and appropriates funds for the department of health to conduct a study on the benefits and costs to implement extended producer responsibility in the State. Part II: Beginning January 1, 2022, prohibits full-service restaurants from providing single-use plastic service ware to consumers unless requested by the consumer. Part III: Beginning January 1, 2023, requires beverage manufacturers that offer for sale, sell, or distribute beverages in plastic beverage containers in the State to meet minimum postconsumer recycled content requirements. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Packaging Waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Matayoshi, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-09HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-09HouseThe committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-21.
2021-02-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback