HI HB1316 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that no employee be required to work more than five hours continuously without a scheduled interval of at least thirty consecutive minutes for a rest or bona fide meal period. Requires employers who do not provide a rest or meal break to employees to be liable to the employee affected in an amount equivalent to one and one-half hours for each thirty minute meal break the employee was not provided.
Title
Labor and Industrial Relations; Meal Breaks
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Friday, 02-04-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1316 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1316_.HTM |