HI HB1314 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB1314

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes each county to levy a county surcharge on transient accommodations tax if the county satisfies certain real property tax requirements and requires those counties to remit certain real property tax revenues to the State to offset the reduction in income tax. Repeals the allocation of transient accommodations tax revenue to the counties and makes conforming amendments. Beginning 1/1/2031, requires certain taxpayers to file an information return to the director of taxation. Establishes a landlord low-income tenant tax credit, residential circuit breaker tax credit, and real property tax credit for certain taxpayers. For counties that adopt certain ordinances, beginning with taxable years after 12/31/2021, gradually implements new individual income tax and corporation income tax brackets and lower tax rates in three-year intervals. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11HouseRecommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.
2021-03-09HouseDeferred one day 03-11-21.
2021-03-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21.
2021-03-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 960) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Nishimoto, Sayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso, Tam, Wildberger; 1 Noes: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, McKelvey, Perruso, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McDermott, Okimoto, Tokioka, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) DeCoite, Ganaden, Tam, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McDermott, Okimoto, Perruso voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 204) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Okimoto; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-01HouseReferred to ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

HB1314 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Recommitted to FIN with Representative Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback