HI HB131 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Hearing: Mar 2 @ 1:00 pm in Conference Room 308 Via Videoconference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of the tax credit for individuals and households and the adjusted gross income eligibility cap for the income tax credit for low-income household renters using tax brackets for individuals and different categories of households. Provides for inflation increases every three years based on the consumer price index. Applicable to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Tax Credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-21.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 482) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-09HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-21HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB302 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback