HI HB1309 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1309

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for state supplemental payments to certain care homes that care for clients eligible for federal supplemental security income or public assistance, or both. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Care Homes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2023-02-16HouseReported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-02-10HouseThe committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Amato, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-02-10HouseThe committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Friday, 02-10-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

HB1309 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback