HI HB1309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1265).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds grants for planning, design, construction, renovation, operations, and equipment of facilities to the types of grants for which repayment to the State is required if the grantee discontinues the activities or services approved in the grant. Designates the Department of Budget and Finance as the negotiating agency for grant repayments. Requires grantees to publicly recognize State support of projects awarded grants. Authorizes expending agencies of grants and capital improvement project funds to delegate their expending authority to a different agency, subject to approval of the grantee and the Governor. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Grants.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-11-17 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1265). |
2017-07-11 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1265). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-17 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1161) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 629). |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har excused (1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 626). |
2017-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-17. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 623). |
2017-04-24 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Cullen Chair; Holt, Tupola. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 506) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 336). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 819) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |