HI HB1302 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1302
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a two-year pilot program to require the department of health to implement the excessive amplified noise control regulation in the Waikiki Special District, which prohibits, with certain exceptions, the emission of excessive amplified noise during certain hours on public sidewalks near certain locations in areas zoned as mixed-use or residential without prior approval from the director of health. Establishes penalties for violations. Requires the department of health to adopt rules and report to the legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Noise Pollution.
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Chun [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1302 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
SB1418 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1418 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Health
Excessive Amplified Noise Control
Honolulu Police Department
Mixed-Use and Residential Zones
Penalties
Pilot Program
Public Sidewalks
Report
Waikiki Special District
Department of Health
Excessive Amplified Noise Control
Honolulu Police Department
Mixed-Use and Residential Zones
Penalties
Pilot Program
Public Sidewalks
Report
Waikiki Special District
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1302&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1302_HD1_.HTM |