HI HB1284 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1284
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 17
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the State's preemption of local ordinances that regulate the sale of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices to allow the counties to enact ordinances more protective of public health than state law. (HB1284 HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 151) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1284 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Re-referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 17