HI HB1283 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 155, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Act 155, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the employers of first responder personnel to obtain dementia training for first responder personnel. Permits the executive office on aging to coordinate the dementia training schedules and standards with all public and private entities and agencies responsible for services provided by first responder personnel. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Act 155, on 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257). |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Act 155, 07/01/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1257). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 156). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 156) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Keohokalole, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-22-21 3:20PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Keohokalole, Moriwaki Co-Chairs. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 771) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1683) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-07-21 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-21 3:05PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-02-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 615) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |