HI HB1282 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1282
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Ichiyama voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Ichiyama voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the application of neonicotinoid insecticides and glyphosate herbicides after December 31, 2019, without a license or permit from the state or federal government. (HB1282 HD1)
Title
Relating To Insecticide And Herbicide Use.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Ichiyama voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from AGR/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 714) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2017-02-13 | House | Re-referred to AGR/EEP, WAL, JUD, referral sheet 18 |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Kong; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Takayama; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to AGR/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1282 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Ichiyama voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).