HI HB1273 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1273
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to make a public disclosure identifying the names of the taxpayers who are receiving certain tax credits and the total amount of tax credit received for specific economic activities. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Tax Credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 100). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 439) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2021-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-12-21 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1273 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to EET, WAM.
SB937 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to EET, WAM.
SB937 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to EET, WAM.